VT H0230 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on June 1, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on June 1, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to implementing mechanisms to reduce suicide and community violence
Title
An act relating to implementing mechanisms to reduce suicide and community violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 106, Nays = 34 (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 104 (Y: 42 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 43 (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 46 (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 104 (Y: 42 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 43 (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 46 (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on June 1, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Allowed to become law without the signature of the Governor on June 1, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 26, 2023 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2023-05-05 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2023-05-05 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 106, Nays = 34 |
2023-05-05 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell demanded yeas and nays |
2023-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2023-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2023-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senator Vyhovsky explained vote |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | House | Read third time and passed |
2023-03-23 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2023-03-23 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 104 |
2023-03-23 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield demanded yeas and nays |
2023-03-23 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill |
2023-03-23 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Morgan of Milton disagreed to |
2023-03-23 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Morgan of Milton disagreed to |
2023-03-23 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to |
2023-03-23 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to |
2023-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-03-22 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care, as amended, agreed to |
2023-03-22 | House | Second division of amendment agreed to |
2023-03-22 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 43 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rep. Black of Essex demanded yeas and nays |
2023-03-22 | House | First division of amendment agreed to |
2023-03-22 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 46 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester demanded yeas and nays |
2023-03-22 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester asked that the question be divided |
2023-03-22 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | House | Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | House | Rep. Black of Essex reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2023-03-22 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-22 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-03-21 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-28 | House | Rep. Houghton of Essex Junction moved that the bill be committed to the Committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to |
2023-02-28 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-02-24 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-23 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |