VT H0230 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to consent by minors for mental health treatment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to consent by minors for mental health treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17
2017-05-17HouseSigned by Governor on May 17, 2017
2017-05-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 11,2017
2017-05-01HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2017-04-20Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-05-01SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-28SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2017-04-28SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2017-04-27HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-27HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield
2017-04-26HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to postpone action until April 27, 2017 which was agreed to
2017-04-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateSenator Benning explained vote
2017-04-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Campion, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 6
2017-04-21SenateMotion agreed to
2017-04-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) McCormack
2017-04-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-20SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-04-20SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-04-19SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-18SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-04-18SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-04-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-23HousePassed
2017-03-23HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 125, Nays = 12
2017-03-23HouseRead Third time
2017-03-22HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-22HouseReport of Committee on Health Care agreed to.
2017-03-22HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the committee on Health Care
2017-03-22HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-10HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback