VT H0225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to possession of a therapeutic dosage of buprenorphine
Title
An act relating to possession of a therapeutic dosage of buprenorphine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 19 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on June 1, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-18 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-14 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-04-09 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-08 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 19 |
2021-04-08 | House | Rep. Morgan, L. of Milton demanded yeas and nays |
2021-04-08 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2021-04-08 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2021-04-08 | House | Read Second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |