VT H0219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Vermont spaying and neutering program
Title
An act relating to the Vermont spaying and neutering program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to postpone action until May 3, 2017 which was agreed to |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-15 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-14 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland recommended for the committee on Agriculture & Forestry |
2017-03-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture & Forestry |