VT H0217 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Smoking In Lodging Establishments, Hospitals, And Child Care Facilities, And On State Lands
Title
An Act Relating To Smoking In Lodging Establishments, Hospitals, And Child Care Facilities, And On State Lands
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - Shall the bill be amended as proposed by the Committe on Human Services, as further amended? (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Campbell agreed to |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Campbell; text |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Motion by Senator Campbell to suspend Rule 73 to allow reconsideration of previous vote taken |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Campbell motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed |
2014-02-28 | House | Read Third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-27 | House | Rep. Hubert of Milton moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Transportation which was not agreed to. |
2014-02-27 | House | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2014-02-27 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 100, Nays = 35 |
2014-02-27 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Till of Jericho withdrawn |
2014-02-27 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the bill |
2014-02-27 | House | Rep. Komline of Dorset, Burditt of West Rutland, Clarkson of Woodstock, Conquest of Newbury, Devereux of Mount Holly, Koch of Barre Town, Masland of Thetford, Mitchell of Fairfax, Ram of Burlington, Sharpe of Bristol, Stevens of Shoreham, and Wilson of Manchester moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services, which was agreed to. |
2014-02-27 | House | Rep. Frank of Underhill reported for the committee on Human Services |
2014-02-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-02-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |