VT H0213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Rep. Toll of Danville moved that the committee on Appropriations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to establishing statewide access to drug and DUI treatment courts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to establishing statewide access to drug and DUI treatment courts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21HouseRep. Toll of Danville moved that the committee on Appropriations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2017-04-20HouseRep. Ancel of Calais moved that the committee on Ways and Means be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to.
2017-03-17HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2017-02-08HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback