VT H0213 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 5/29/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 5/29/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Fairness To Tenants In Cases Of Contested Housing Security Deposit Withholding
Title
An Act To Provide Fairness To Tenants In Cases Of Contested Housing Security Deposit Withholding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on 5/29/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/25/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset. | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2010-05-08 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Head of South Burlington | |
2010-05-06 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Head of South Burlington | |
2010-05-05 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Head of South Burlington | |
2010-05-04 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Head of South Burlington | |
2010-05-03 | Motion by Senator Illuzzi to request House to return custody of bill to Senate agreed to | |
2010-04-30 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-04-30 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2010-04-30 | Consideration Postponed/Third Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-29 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-04-28 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-04-28 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2010-04-28 | Reported favorably by Senator Campbell for Committee on Judiciary with proposal of amendment | |
2010-04-28 | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-04-28 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-28 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-28 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2010-04-27 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-27 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-27 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-27 | Consideration postponed; Second reading | |
2010-04-26 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-26 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-26 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-26 | Consideration postponed; Second reading | |
2010-04-23 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-23 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-22 | Consideration postponed; Second reading | |
2010-04-21 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-21 | Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2010-04-21 | Senator Illuzzi motion to order bill to lie on the table | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-20 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-19 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2010-04-16 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2010-04-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Committed to Committee on Judiciary with report of Committee on Finance intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2009-04-29 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2009-04-29 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2009-04-01 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 58, Nays = 82 | |
2009-04-01 | Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City demanded yeas and nays | |
2009-04-01 | Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to | |
2009-03-27 | Action Postponed until 4/1/2009 as moved by Rep Head of South Burlington | |
2009-03-26 | Read Second Time and Third Reading Ordered | |
2009-03-26 | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2009-02-13 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |