VT H0205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the regulation of neonicotinoid pesticides
Title
An act relating to the regulation of neonicotinoid pesticides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Agriculture |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-27 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-26 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to |
2019-03-26 | House | Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | House | Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to commit bill to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-02-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |