VT H0205 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by Governor on 5/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by Governor on 5/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Professions And Occupations Regulated By The Office Of Professional Regulation
Title
An Act Relating To Professions And Occupations Regulated By The Office Of Professional Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/9/2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Division of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment not agreed to |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sears motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2013-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2013-03-01 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2013-02-27 | House | Rep. Rep. Evans of Essex reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2013-02-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-02-06 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |