VT H0196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to paid family leave
Title
An act relating to paid family leave
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 53 (Y: 90 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 88, Nays = 58 (Y: 88 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 57 (Y: 89 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 88 (Y: 57 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 88, Nays = 58 (Y: 88 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 57 (Y: 89 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 88 (Y: 57 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-11 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 53 |
2018-05-11 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2018-05-09 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 23, Nays 7 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs and Finance intact, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-05-03 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 88, Nays = 58 |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read Third time |
2017-05-03 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-03 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to amend the bill |
2017-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-05-02 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs as amended agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to amend the report of the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2017-05-02 | House | Report of the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 57 |
2017-05-02 | House | Report of the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Parent of St. Albans Town moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 88 |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to substitute an amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Trieber of Rockingham recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2017-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to postpone action until May 2, 2017 |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |