VT H0182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 4, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to certain businesses regulated by the Department of Financial Regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to certain businesses regulated by the Department of Financial Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 4, 2017
2017-05-04HouseSigned by Governor on May 4, 2017
2017-04-19HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-04-14HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-13SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-13SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-12Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-04-12SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2017-04-12SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance
2017-04-12SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2017-04-12SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2017-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2017-03-03HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-03HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-03-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-03HouseRecommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to
2017-03-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-03HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2017-03-03HouseRep. Baser of Bristol recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-03HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2017-02-02HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback