VT H0177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State on June 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State on June 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of an amendment to the charter of the City of Montpelier
Title
An act relating to approval of an amendment to the charter of the City of Montpelier
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Veto of Governor overridden on a roll call Yeas = 20, Nays = 10 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 100 of 150 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 47 (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Veto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 103, Nays = 47 (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 39 (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 100 of 150 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 47 (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Veto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 103, Nays = 47 (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 39 (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State on June 24, 2021 |
2021-06-23 | House | Senate Message, Governor's veto overridden |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Veto of Governor overridden on a roll call Yeas = 20, Nays = 10 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor & placed on notice calendar for Thursday, June 24, 2021 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | House Message: Bill passed, the veto of the Governor notwithstanding |
2021-06-23 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-06-23 | House | Veto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 103, Nays = 47 |
2021-06-23 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor vetoed bill; text of veto message |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor vetoed bill on June 1, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on June 1, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2021-03-11 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-10 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 39 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2021-03-10 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2021-03-10 | House | Read Second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |