VT H0170 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to possession and cultivation of marijuana by a person 21? years of age or older

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to possession and cultivation of marijuana by a person 21? years of age or older

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 75, Nays = 71 (Y: 75 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 58, Nays = 88 (Y: 58 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 68 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 99 (Y: 42 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 64, Nays = 77 (Y: 64 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 85 (Y: 57 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 75, Nays = 71
2017-05-03HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-03HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 58, Nays = 88
2017-05-03HouseRep. Fagan of Rutland City moved to commit the bill to the committee on Health Care
2017-05-03HouseRead Third time
2017-05-03HouseThird instance of amendment disagreed to
2017-05-03HouseFirst Instance of amendment disagreed to
2017-05-03HouseSecond instance of amendment agreed to
2017-05-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-03HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield asked that the question be divided
2017-05-03HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2017-05-03HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2017-05-03HouseFirst Instance of amendment disagreed to
2017-05-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-03HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield asked that the question be divided
2017-05-03HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2017-05-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-03HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2017-05-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-05-02HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
2017-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 68
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Fagan of Rutland City moved to postpone action until May 3, 2017
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 42, Nays = 99
2017-05-02HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 64, Nays = 77
2017-05-02HouseRep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester moved to commit the bill to the committee on Transportation
2017-05-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02HouseReport of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Human Services
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 85
2017-05-02HouseRep. Cupoli of Rutland City moved to commit the bill to the committee on Transportation
2017-05-02HouseRep. Olsen of Londonderry reported for the committee on Human Services
2017-05-02HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-05-02HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-28HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to.
2017-03-28HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-28HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-01HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback