VT H0159 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to community and economic development and workforce revitalization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to community and economic development and workforce revitalization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 148 to Pass -- Yeas = 148, Nays = 0 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-03-25HouseRead Third time and passed
2021-03-24HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-03-24HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
2021-03-24HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 148 to Pass -- Yeas = 148, Nays = 0
2021-03-24HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry demanded yeas and nays
2021-03-24HouseRep. Mulvaney-Stanak of Burlington moved to amend the report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, which was agreed to
2021-03-24HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-24HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseRep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-24HouseRep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-24HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2021-03-24HouseRead Second time
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2021-01-29HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback