VT H0155 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Campbell
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Campbell
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property-assessed Clean Energy Districts
Title
An Act Relating To Property-assessed Clean Energy Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-14 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-04-07 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-04-05 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry and Cheney of Norwich agreed to | |
2011-03-31 | Rep. Rep. Masland of Thetford, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-31 | Rep. Rep. Cheney of Norwich reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2011-04-01 | Read Second Time | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-02-01 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |