VT H0153 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/31/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/31/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Trafficking
Title
An Act Relating To Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] | Rep. Mark Larson [D] | Rep. William Lippert [D] | Rep. Cynthia Martin [D] |
Rep. Ann Pugh [D] | Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] | Rep. Suzi Wizowaty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/31/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/25/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2011-05-03 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Flory; text | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears; text | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory | |
2011-05-02 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears | |
2011-05-02 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2011-04-29 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-29 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-18 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 131, Nays = 5 | |
2011-02-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-02-17 | Report of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to | |
2011-02-17 | Floor Amendment by Rep. Weston of Burlington agreed to | |
2011-02-17 | Rep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | Read Second Time | |
2011-02-16 | Action Postponed until 2/17/2011 as moved by Rep Grad of Moretown | |
2011-02-01 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |