VT H0152 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee on Education relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campion
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to education property tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to education property tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateCommittee on Education relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campion
2021-03-30SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
2021-03-25HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-03-25HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Sibilia of Dover, Colburn of Burlington, Pajala of Londonderry, Sims of Craftsbury, and Small of Winooski withdrawn
2021-03-24HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-03-24HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
2021-03-24HouseRep. Beck of St. Johnsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-24HouseRead Second Time
2021-03-16HouseRep. Webb of Shelburne moved that the Committee on Education be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the Committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to
2021-02-02HouseCommitted to Committee on Education by motion of Rep. Webb of Shelburne
2021-01-28HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on January 29, 2021

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback