VT H0150 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 15, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 15, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of an amendment to the charter of the Village of Alburgh
Title
An act relating to approval of an amendment to the charter of the Village of Alburgh
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 9, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2023-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Norris for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-04-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-04-05 | House | Read third time and passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-04-04 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs agreed to |
2023-04-04 | House | Rep. Morgan of Milton reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2023-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-04 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-03-31 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |