VT H0146 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 8, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to amendments to the charter of the Northeast Kingdom Waste Management District

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to amendments to the charter of the Northeast Kingdom Waste Management District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 8, 2023
2023-05-08HouseSigned by Governor on May 8, 2023
2023-05-02HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 2, 2023
2023-04-27HouseSenate Message, passed in concurrence
2023-04-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2023-04-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-04-25SenateReported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2023-04-25SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2023-04-25SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-04-21SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2023-04-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-04-12SenateReferred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2023-04-06SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2023-04-04HouseRead third time and passed
2023-04-04HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2023-03-31HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-03-31HouseRep. Higley of Lowell reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
2023-03-31HouseRead second time
2023-03-31HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2023-03-30HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable
2023-02-01HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback