VT H0143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on February 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on February 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to appointing town agents
Title
An act relating to appointing town agents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on February 5, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Signed by Governor on February 4, 2020. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-01-29 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-01-24 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-01-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-07 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-07 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |