VT H0132 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prohibiting discrimination against persons without homes
Title
An act relating to prohibiting discrimination against persons without homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-02-23 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-02-22 | House | Report of Committee on General and Housing agreed to |
2024-02-22 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the Committee on General and Housing |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing |