VT H0125 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 6/8/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Sale Of Unpasteurized (raw) Milk

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Sale Of Unpasteurized (raw) Milk

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-12 Signed by Governor on 6/8/2009
2009-05-12 Delivered to the Governor on 6/2/2009
2009-05-09 See entry for S.R. 4, relating to H. 125, during special session convened on June 2, 2009
2009-05-08 Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin.
2009-05-08 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 102, Nays = 38
2009-05-08 Rep. Johnson of Canaan demanded yeas and nays
2009-05-08 Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2009-05-08 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
2009-05-07 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-07 Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 3
2009-05-07 Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-07 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 11 of 21 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 2
2009-05-07 Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2009-05-07 Reported favorably by Senator Kittell for Committee on Agriculture with proposal of amendment
2009-05-07 Read 2nd time
2009-05-07 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-06 Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-06 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-04 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2009-05-01 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
2009-05-01 Read Third time and Passed
2009-05-01 Floor Amendment by Rep. Stevens of Shoreham agreed to
2009-05-01 Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 56, Nays = 67
2009-05-01 Rep. Morrissey of Bennington demanded yeas and nays
2009-05-01 Floor Amendment by Rep. Savage of Swanton disagreed to
2009-05-01 Amendment as offered by Rep. Branagan of Georgia and Dickinson of St. Albans Town disagreed to
2009-05-01 Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 64 of 126 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 73
2009-05-01 Rep. Nease of Johnson demanded yeas and nays
2009-05-01 Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield and Dickinson of St. Albans Town disagreed to
2009-05-01 Amendment as offered by Rep. Till of Jericho disagreed to
2009-05-01 Amendment as offered by Rep. Hubert of Milton disagreed to
2009-05-01 Amendment as offered by Rep. Bray of New Haven agreed to
2009-04-30 Amendment of Committee on Agriculture agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
2009-04-30 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 96, Nays = 40
2009-04-30 Rep. Wright of Burlington demanded yeas and nays
2009-04-30 Read Second Time
2009-04-30 Rep. Lawrence of Lyndon reported for the committee on Agriculture
2009-02-03 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback