VT H0123 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Lyme Disease And Other Tick-borne Illnesses
Title
An Act Relating To Lyme Disease And Other Tick-borne Illnesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - Shall the amendment of the committee on Health Care be amended as proposed by Rep. Till of Jericho? (Y: 57 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Shall the bill be amended as reccomended by the committee on Health Care? (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Shall the bill be amended as reccomended by the committee on Health Care? (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2014-05-01 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-04-30 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-04-29 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2014-04-25 | House | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2014-04-25 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 79 |
2014-04-25 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was disagreed to |
2014-04-25 | House | Rep. Fisher of Lincoln spoke for the committee on Health Care |
2014-04-17 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho moved to commit bill to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator Zuckerman proposal of amendment, agreed to |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator Sirotkin proposal of amendment, agreed to |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2014-04-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collins, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-11 | House | Amendment of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2014-03-11 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Fisher of Lincoln reported for the committee on Health Care |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-01-29 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |