VT H0121 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to enhancing consumer privacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to enhancing consumer privacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 0 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2024-03-22HousePassed
2024-03-22HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 0
2024-03-22HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry demanded yeas and nays
2024-03-22HouseRead third time
2024-03-22HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2024-03-21HouseThird Reading ordered
2024-03-21HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, as amended, agreed to
2024-03-21HouseRep. Andriano of Orwell moved to amend the report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, which was agreed to
2024-03-21HouseRep. Priestley of Bradford reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2024-03-21HouseRead second time
2024-03-21HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2024-03-20HouseRep. Priestley of Bradford moved to postpone action until 03/21/2024
2024-03-20HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2024-03-19HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-01-26HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback