VT H0112 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor on 5/10/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor on 5/10/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to access to financial information in adult protective services investigations.
Title
An act relating to access to financial information in adult protective services investigations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Pugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/10/16 |
2016-05-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/10/16 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2016-04-27 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-04-27 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-04-26 | House | Rep. Berry of Manchester moved to postpone action until 4/27/16 which was agreed to |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare agreed to |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-04-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health & Welfare on motion of Senator Sears |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-09 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to. |
2016-03-09 | House | Rep. Berry of Manchester reported for the committee on Human Services |
2016-03-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |