VT H0106 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to equitable access to a high-quality education through community schools
Title
An act relating to equitable access to a high-quality education through community schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 6 (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 2, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-18 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-05-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 6 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Balint for Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Education |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2021-05-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-19 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-18 | House | Report of Committee on Education as amended agreed to |
2021-03-18 | House | Report of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | House | Rep. James of Manchester reported for the Committee on Education |
2021-03-18 | House | Read Second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education |