VT H0095 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by Governor on 6/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by Governor on 6/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to jurisdiction over delinquency proceedings by the Family Division of the Superior Court
Title
An act relating to jurisdiction over delinquency proceedings by the Family Division of the Superior Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor on 6/1/16 |
2016-05-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/31/16 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2016-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-05-05 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Jewett of Ripton |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears; text |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-29 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Jewett of Ripton |
2016-04-29 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-04-27 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | Read Third time |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2015-03-18 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2015-03-18 | House | Rep. Jewett of Ripton reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-01-29 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |