VT H0091 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/31/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/31/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Management Of Fish And Wildlife
Title
An Act Relating To The Management Of Fish And Wildlife
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/31/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/25/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/5/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2011-05-04 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2011-05-04 | Revised Committee of Conference reported submitted by Senator Benning for Committee, text | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference report discarded | |
2011-05-04 | Point of order sustained by the President | |
2011-05-04 | Point of order raised by Senator Starr on ground Conference Committee breached Sec. 771.2 of Mason's Manual of Legislative Procedure | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Benning for Committee, text | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2011-05-04 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-22 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-28 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, McCormack, and Benning | |
2011-04-28 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-27 | Speaker appointed Webb of Shelburne, Deen of Westminster and Krebs of South Hero as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2011-04-27 | Committee of Conference appointed | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Webb of Shelburne | |
2011-04-27 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-26 | Proposal of amendment not agreed to | |
2011-04-26 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Starr motion to amend proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Starr | |
2011-04-21 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-20 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Illuzzi, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 | |
2011-04-20 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to | |
2011-04-20 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as moved by Senator(s) Benning | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2011-04-20 | Motion disagreed to | |
2011-04-20 | Senator Kittell motion to commit bill to Committee on Agriculture | |
2011-04-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2011-03-25 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2011-03-23 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City withdrawn | |
2011-03-23 | Rep. Komline of Dorset moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2011-03-22 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 102, Nays = 39 | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-03-22 | Report of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to. | |
2011-03-17 | Rep. Rep. Webb of Shelburne reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2011-03-22 | Read Second Time | |
2011-03-16 | Action postponed until 3/22/2011 as moved by Rep. Webb of Shelburne | |
2011-01-25 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |