VT H0088 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction And Enforcement
Title
An Act Relating To Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction And Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/13/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/28/2001 | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-28 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2011-04-28 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2011-04-28 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-27 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-27 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-26 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-22 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-18 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-15 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-15 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-15 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Flory and Nitka; text | |
2011-04-15 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-04-15 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-15 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory and Nitka | |
2011-04-15 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-14 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-13 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-12 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-16 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-02-15 | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-02-15 | Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington spoke for the committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-21 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |