VT H0083 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to female genital cutting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to female genital cutting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-02-13SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-02-13SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-02-12Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-02-12SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2020-02-12SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-12SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-02-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-04-12SenateCommittee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Sears
2019-03-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-21HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-20HouseReport of Committee on Health Care agreed to.
2019-03-20HouseRep. Houghton of Essex reported for the committee on Health Care
2019-03-20HouseRead Second Time
2019-01-24HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback