VT H0079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to eligibility for farm-to-school grant assistance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to eligibility for farm-to-school grant assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-02-21HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-02-20HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-02-20HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to.
2019-02-20HouseRep. O'Brien of Tunbridge reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-02-20HouseRead Second Time
2019-01-24HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback