VT H0078 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Wages For Laid-off Employees
Title
An Act Relating To Wages For Laid-off Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Galbraith | |
2012-05-05 | Motion by Senator Galbraith to reconsider action taken on previous day in which the Senate refused to concur in House proposal of amendment, agreed to | |
2012-05-04 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; on motion of Senator Galbraith | |
2012-05-04 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. O'Sullivan of Burlington | |
2012-05-04 | Amendment as offered by Rep. O'Sullivan of Burlington agreed to | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-01 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-05-01 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-05-01 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-01 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Galbraith; text | |
2012-05-01 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-04-30 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Flory | |
2012-04-30 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-04-30 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-19 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Galbraith for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. O'Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-20 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |