VT H0063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Delivered to the Governor on June 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to weatherization, a Public Utility Commission proceeding, and unclaimed beverage container deposits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to weatherization, a Public Utility Commission proceeding, and unclaimed beverage container deposits

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 11, 2019
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-23SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
2019-05-23SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-23HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2019-05-23SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2019-05-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-22SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2019-05-22HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-22HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs
2019-05-17HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2
2019-05-17SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-17SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Perchlik motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-17SenatePending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik
2019-05-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray agreed to
2019-05-16SenateConsideration resumed
2019-05-16SenateConsideration postponed on motion of Senator Pearson
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray; text
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Perchlik, Ashe, Balint, and Bray; text
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Ashe, Balint, and Bray
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-03SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Bray
2019-05-03SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Bray
2019-02-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-02-14HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-02-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-02-13HouseReport of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to.
2019-02-13HouseRep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-13HouseRep. Forguites of Springfield reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
2019-02-13HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-01-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback