VT H0053 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact
Title
An Act Relating To The Interstate Wildlife Violator Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/8/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/8/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-20 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-19 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-19 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2012-04-19 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-02 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-02 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-05-02 | Report of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to. | |
2011-05-02 | Rep. Rep. Krebs of South Hero reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2011-05-02 | Read Second Time | |
2011-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-01-18 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |