VT H0026 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to restricting retail and Internet sales of electronic cigarettes, liquid nicotine, and tobacco paraphernalia in Vermont

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to restricting retail and Internet sales of electronic cigarettes, liquid nicotine, and tobacco paraphernalia in Vermont

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSigned by Governor on May 16, 2019
2019-05-14HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 14, 2019
2019-05-16SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 16, 2019
2019-05-02HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2019-05-01SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-04-30SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Sears,  Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Hooker for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2019-04-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-04-30SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-04-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-04-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-12HouseReport of Committee on Human Services agreed to.
2019-03-12HouseRep. Brumsted of Shelburne reported for the committee on Human Services
2019-03-12HouseRead Second Time
2019-01-15HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback