VT H0026 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Signed by Governor on 5/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Signed by Governor on 5/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Technical Corrections
Title
An Act Relating To Technical Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/20/2013 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2013-01-25 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-01-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-01-24 | House | Rep. Hubert of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2013-01-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-01-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |