VT H0025 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to domestic terrorism
Title
An act relating to domestic terrorism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-05-02 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury, Burditt of West Rutland, Colburn of Burlington, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Grad of Moretown, Jessup of Middlesex, Lalonde of South Burlington, Morris of Bennington, Rachelson of Burlington, Viens of Newport City, and Willhoit of St. Johnsbury moved to concur with the Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2018-04-27 | House | Action postponed until May 2, 2018 as moved by Rep. Conquest of Newbury |
2018-04-25 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senator(s) Sears motion to amend Committee on Judiciary proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-02-17 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-02-17 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-02-16 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2017-02-16 | House | Rep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |