VT H0014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to automated external defibrillators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to automated external defibrillators

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-08HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-02-07HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-02-07HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-02-07HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-02-07HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-10HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback