VT H0013 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 90, Nays = 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 90, Nays = 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government
Title
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 90, Nays = 51 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-19 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 95 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 51 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-07 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 3 (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 20 (Y: 5 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-06-05 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 83, Nays = 40 (Y: 83 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 62 of 122 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 77 (Y: 45 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-06-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 86, Nays = 44 (Y: 86 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-01 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 84 (Y: 46 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-05-30 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 101 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 82, Nays = 52 (Y: 82 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-06-19 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 95 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 51 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-07 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 3 (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 20 (Y: 5 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-06-05 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 83, Nays = 40 (Y: 83 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 62 of 122 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 77 (Y: 45 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-06-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 86, Nays = 44 (Y: 86 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-01 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 84 (Y: 46 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-05-30 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 101 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 82, Nays = 52 (Y: 82 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 90, Nays = 51 |
2018-06-19 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 95 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 51 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | House message: Governor vetoed bill on June 14, 2018 |
2018-06-14 | House | Vetoed by the Governor and placed on Notice Calendar on June 14, 2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 3 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 20 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment not agreed to |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock, Branagan, Collamore, and Soucy; text |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-06-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-05 | House | Passed |
2018-06-05 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 62 of 123 to Pass -- Yeas = 83, Nays = 40 |
2018-06-05 | House | Read Third time |
2018-06-05 | House | Rep. Quimby of Concord asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-06-05 | House | Rep. Quimby of Concord moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-05 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-05 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 62 of 122 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 77 |
2018-06-05 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-05 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-05 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-06-01 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 86, Nays = 44 |
2018-06-01 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-01 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney and Canfield of Fair Haven moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-01 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-06-01 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-01 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-06-01 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 66 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 84 |
2018-06-01 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington, Baser of Bristol, Sullivan of Dorset, and Wright of Burlington moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-01 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Toll of Danville agreed to |
2018-06-01 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville moved to amend the bill |
2018-06-01 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-06-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-06-01 | House | Rep. Baser of Bristol raised a Point of Order |
2018-05-30 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-05-30 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 101 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 82, Nays = 52 |
2018-05-30 | House | Rep. Krowinski of Burlington moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2018-05-30 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on May 30, 2018 |