VT H0010 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 13, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to amending the Vermont Employment Growth Incentive Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to amending the Vermont Employment Growth Incentive Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 13, 2024
2024-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on June 13, 2024
2024-05-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 7, 2024
2024-05-10SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2024-05-10HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2024-05-10HouseRules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2024-05-10HouseNotice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment
2024-05-10HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2024-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2024-05-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2024-05-09SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth
2024-05-09Senate3rd reading ordered
2024-05-09SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2024-05-09SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2024-05-09SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
2024-05-09SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Harrison for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2024-05-09SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2024-04-23SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2024-04-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2024-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2024-04-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2024-03-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2024-03-21HouseRead third time and passed
2024-03-21HouseAction Calendar: Third Reading
2024-03-20HouseThird Reading ordered
2024-03-20HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, as amended, agreed to
2024-03-20HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by Committee on Ways and Means
2024-03-20HouseRep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2024-03-20HouseRep. Anthony of Barre City recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2024-03-20HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2024-03-20HouseRead second time
2024-03-20HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2024-03-19HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2024-03-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2024-03-14HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-03-16HousePending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2023-01-05HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback