VT H0005 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to investment of town cemetery funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to investment of town cemetery funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
2017-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on May 10, 2017
2017-04-28SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2017-04-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-04-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-20Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-04-20SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations
2017-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2017-04-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-03HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-03HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-03-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-03HouseRecommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2017-03-03HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-05HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback