VT H0004 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to calculating time periods in court proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to calculating time periods in court proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on 5/1/2017
2017-05-01HouseSigned by Governor on May 1, 2017
2017-04-05HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2017-04-04SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2017-04-04SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-31SenateRemarks of Senator Benning journalized
2017-03-31Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-31SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-31SenateReported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-31SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-31SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-03-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-30SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-03HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-02HouseRecommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-03-02HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-05HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback