VT H0003 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to ethnic and social equity studies standards for public schools
Title
An act relating to ethnic and social equity studies standards for public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence on roll call, requested by Senator Ingram, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingram, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 0 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingram, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 0 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on March 29, 2019 |
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by Governor on March 29, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-03-13 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-03-01 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence on roll call, requested by Senator Ingram, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears agreed to |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingram, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Education |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read Third time |
2019-01-31 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-01-31 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-01-31 | House | Rep. Austin of Colchester, Giambatista of Essex, Batchelor of Derby, Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, Elder of Starksboro, Hooper of Randolph, James of Manchester, Mattos of Milton, Toof of St. Albans Town, and Webb of Shelburne moved to substitute an amendment |
2019-01-31 | House | Rep. Giambatista of Essex recommended for the committee on Education |
2019-01-31 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-01-30 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Giambatista of Essex |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |