VA SR32 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR32ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR32ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Angela Sumner Murphy.
Title
Commending Angela Sumner Murphy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate (SR32ER) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 13103131D |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Presented 13103131D |