VA SJR9 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Tabled in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Study; State Crime Commission; reinstatement of Study; State Crime Commission; reinstatement of discretionary parole; report. Directs the State Crime Commission to study the reinstatement of discretionary parole, which was abolished in 1995.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discretionary parole; State Crime Commission to study reinstatement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Tabled in Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseTabled in Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20101371D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SJ9E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
2019-12-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-12-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101371D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback