VA SJR87 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appalachian Cherokee Nation, Incorporated. Extends state recognition to the Appalachian Cherokee Nation, Incorporated. This resolution was continued to the 2015 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Appalachian Cherokee Nation, Incorporated; General Assembly to extend state recognition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Rules |
2014-03-03 | House | Continued to 2015 in Rules by voice vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103486D |