VA SJR83 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ83ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ83ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Mary T. Christian.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Mary T. Christian.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ83ER) |
2020-02-03 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-01-31 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2020-01-31 | House | Received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Presented 20101659D |