VA SJR76 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ76ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ76ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Vector Industries, Inc., on the occasion of its 40th anniversary
Title
Commending Vector Industries, Inc., on the occasion of its 40th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ76ER) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2010-01-22 | House: Received | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 10101341D | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/10 10101341D |