VA SJR62 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ62ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Washington Nationals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Washington Nationals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ62ER)
2020-01-20HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2020-01-17HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2020-01-17HouseReceived
2020-01-16SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-01-16SenateEngrossed by Senate
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/08/20 20101717D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback