VA SJR5001 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5001ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the East Coast Surfing Championship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the East Coast Surfing Championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5001ER)
2021-02-15HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2021-02-12HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2021-02-12HouseReceived
2021-02-11SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2021-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate
2021-02-11SenateRules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2021-02-10SenatePresented 21200061D
2021-02-10SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback